+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-322.
- Signed by President.
On July 29, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On July 28, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On July 28, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On July 23, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On July 23, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged in Senate.
On June 11, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On June 9, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On May 16, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 96-1011.
On February 28, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor