+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 12, 1977 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-128.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 5, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 4, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #625 .
On October 1, 1977 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #513 .
On September 26, 1977 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-634.
On June 22, 1977 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On June 16, 1977 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On June 7, 1977 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 1523 , roll call #177 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
On May 13, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
On May 11, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #223 .
- Measure considered in House.
On May 10, 1977 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
On May 6, 1977 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 2, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs, H. Rept. 95-236.
On April 26, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor