+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On December 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On December 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
On December 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On December 5, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On December 4, 2012 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
+ − Sponsor
Donna M. Christensen
Type:
Primary Sponsor