+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Appropriations
- Referred to House House Administration
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor