+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-415.
- Signed by President.
On September 9, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On September 8, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 8, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 7, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 7, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 27, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, S. Rept. 94-1179.
On October 7, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On October 6, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On September 15, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 94-481.
On May 1, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor