+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 86 and Rule XXIII.
- Rule H. Res. 86 passed House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 661 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Points of Order for failure to comply with clause 4 of rule XIII are waived. After general debate, the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. The Chairman of the Committee of the Whole may accord priority to those who have printed their amendments in the Congressional Record. At the conclusion of consideration of the bill for amendment, the Committee shall rise and report the bill to the House with amendments as may have been adopted. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 86 .
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Richard Burr to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 661 .
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 661 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- On passage Passed by voice vote.
On March 2, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 86 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 661 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Points of Order for failure to comply with clause 4 of rule XIII are waived. After general debate, the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. The Chairman of the Committee of the Whole may accord priority to those who have printed their amendments in the Congressional Record. At the conclusion of consideration of the bill for amendment, the Committee shall rise and report the bill to the House with amendments as may have been adopted. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 20.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-35 .
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor