+ − Summary
+ − Actions (28)
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 18, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 3, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 22, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 23, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 16, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 8, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 5, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 29, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 17, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 16, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 10, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 9, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 20, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 19, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 13, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 12, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 22, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 14, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 14, 1981 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held in Lexington, Kentucky.
On March 13, 1981 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held in Ashland, Kentucky.
On March 3, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 25, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 24, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 18, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Dept of Ed.
On February 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
On January 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor