+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On October 31, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-86.
- Signed by President.
On October 20, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 18, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 659 .
- Mr. Doolittle moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Amendment SP 2295 proposed by Senator Santorum for Senator Murkowski.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.2295 Proposed by Senator Santorum for Senator Murkowski. In the nature of a substitute.
- Amendment SP 2295 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2295 Amendment SP 2295 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 22, 1999 in the House:
- H.AMDT.226 Amendment offered by Mr. Klink. An amendment to require Congressional authorization for certain new construction within Gettysburg National Military Park.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 210 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 659 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill, the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Resources now printed in the bill. Measure will be read by title. Bill is open to amendments.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 210 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Ray LaHood to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 659 .
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 210 and Rule XXIII.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 659 .
- H.AMDT.226 By unanimous consent, the Klink amendment was withdrawn.
- H.AMDT.227 Amendment offered by Mr. Traficant. An amendment to urge the Valley Forge Historical Society to buy American-made products to the greatest degree practicable.
- H.AMDT.227 On agreeing to the Traficant amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 418 - 4 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 16, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 210 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 659 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill, the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Resources now printed in the bill. Measure will be read by title. Bill is open to amendments.
On May 13, 1999 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-139 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 78.
On April 28, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 11, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Amendments (3)
H.AMDT.226
An amendment to require Congressional authorization for certain new construction within Gettysburg National Military Park.
H.AMDT.227
An amendment to urge the Valley Forge Historical Society to buy American-made products to the greatest degree practicable.
S.AMDT.2295
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor