+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 24, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-289.
- Signed by President.
On May 14, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On May 9, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On May 9, 1974 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On April 8, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 1835 , roll call #124 .
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged in Senate.
On May 8, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 7, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #125 .
On April 12, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 93-132.
On April 4, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor