+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 29, 1977 in the House:
- Measure laid on table, S. 1339 passed in lieu.
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #609 .
- Motion to recommit to the Committee on Armed Services rejected in House.
- Measure considered in House.
On September 28, 1977 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
On September 13, 1977 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 16, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Science and Technology with amendment, H. Rept. 95-272 .
On May 9, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
- Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 95-272 .
On April 22, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor