+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by President.
On October 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 13, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report.
On October 6, 1978 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-1293.
On October 4, 1978 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1713.
On September 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On September 7, 1978 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On August 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On July 20, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs, S. Rept. 95-1025.
On September 27, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 26, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #583 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 16, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 95-335.
On April 21, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor