+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 13, 1977 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-131.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 5, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 4, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 4, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On September 28, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
On September 26, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #587 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 5, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia with amendment, H. Rept. 95-248.
On April 21, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor