+ − Actions (18)
On January 8, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-437.
- Signed by President.
On January 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 23, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 14, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On December 13, 1982 in the House:
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On September 29, 1982 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From OMB.
On September 28, 1982 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From Treasury.
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From OPM.
On June 14, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, OMB, OPM.
On June 7, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On May 27, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor