+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 875.
- Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Education and the Workforce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1088, Part I.
On September 13, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
On July 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (229)
Rob Bishop
Type:
Primary Sponsor