+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 18, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-475.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 5, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 3, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 3, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On September 26, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, S. Rept. 95-1240.
On May 9, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On May 8, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On June 30, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 95-474.
On April 21, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor