+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 3, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-411.
- Signed by President.
On August 22, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On August 21, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On August 21, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On August 19, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry, S. Rept. 93-1106.
On July 23, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.
On July 22, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On June 20, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Agriculture with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1131.
On April 3, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor