+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On August 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
On August 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On July 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
On July 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (3)
Carlos Curbelo
Type:
Primary Sponsor