+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-601.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434.
On July 13, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
- Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
- Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.