+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-639, Part I.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor