+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 1977 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-36.
- Signed by President.
On May 24, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On May 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On May 23, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On May 19, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On May 19, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 17, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #249 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On May 12, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 95-303.
On April 20, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor