+ − Actions (6)
On September 16, 1982 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From GAO.
On September 8, 1982 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Merit Systems Protection Brd.
On June 28, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Merit Systems Protection Brd, OPM.
On June 14, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Office of Special Counsel, OMB, GAO.
On May 24, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On May 17, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor