+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 25, 2015 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-89. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On November 19, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8212-8213)
- Mr. Griffith asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8212-8213)
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2748 Amendment SA 2748 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2748 Amendment SA 2748 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S7495)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7495)
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7495)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 26.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-41, Part I.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1638-1641)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 639.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1638-1639)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.2748
In the nature of a substitute.