+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-481.
- Signed by President.
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 8, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6338 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor