+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-271.
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On January 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Mr. Bilirakis moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 6328 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilirakis objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
On December 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3328 Amendment SA 3328 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Gillibrand. To clarify that the clothing should be transferred to the local airport authority or other local authorities for donation to charity, including local veterans organizations or other local charitable organizations for distribution to homeless or needy veterans and veteran families.
- S.AMDT.3328 Amendment SA 3328 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On November 27, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6328 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 5, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
On August 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3328
To clarify that the clothing should be transferred to the local airport authority or other local authorities for donation to charity, including local veterans organizations or other local charitable organizations for distribution to homeless or needy veterans and veteran families.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor