+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-140. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage, as amended Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1869-1870)
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
- Without objection, the Chair laid before the House H.R. 6322 with an amendment. The reading of the amendment was dispensed with and the amendment was agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H1868-1870)
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (3)
H.Amdt.815
As of the purpose for this amendment has not been received.
H.Amdt.816
As of the purpose for this amendment has not been received.
H.Amdt.817
As of the purpose for this amendment has not been received.
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor