+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On July 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 19, 2008 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On June 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and Labor
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor