+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-368.
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 348 - 11 (Roll no. 442). (text: CR H10298-10300)
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith (TX) objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 6227.
- Mr. Smith (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10297-10302, H10317-10318)
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4114 Amendment SA 4114 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7625)
- S.Amdt.4114 Amendment SA 4114 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Thune. In the nature of a substitute.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8229-8231)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6227.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8229-8234)
- Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 740.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-950.
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 4114
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4114
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor