+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On July 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 22, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6226 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Higgins moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 16, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 10, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor