+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10140-10141)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10140-10141)
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
- Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On July 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6473)
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Ted Poe
Type:
Primary Sponsor