+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 22, 2010 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-327.
- Signed by President.
On December 17, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 16, 2010 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 6198 .
- Ms. Chu moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On November 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.4718 Amendment SA 4718 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Hatch. To make a technical correction.
- S.AMDT.4718 Amendment SA 4718 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 28, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6198 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Scott moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 23, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4718
To make a technical correction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor