+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7643)
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H4711-4712)
- H.Amdt.887 On agreeing to the Cleaver amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- H.Amdt.887 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Cleaver. (consideration: CR H4711-4712; text: CR H4711-4712)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4711-4712)
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Mr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.887
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor