+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 1995 in the House:
- See S.178 .
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
- Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 104-104 .
On April 4, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held. Hearings Printed: H. Hrg. 104-6.
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received from Commodity Futures Trading Com.
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commodity Futures Trading Com.
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Risk Management and Specialty Crops.
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor