+ − Actions (17)
On October 25, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-364.
- Signed by President.
On October 13, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 29, 1982 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On September 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 929.
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 540.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 97-867.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On May 12, 1982 in the House:
- Provisions of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.6211 .
On May 4, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
On April 29, 1982 in the House:
- Hearings Held by Subcommittee on Surface Transportation Prior to Referral .
On April 27, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor