+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On October 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On September 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
On August 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On August 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On July 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On July 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On July 19, 2012 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On July 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Armed Services, Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor