+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 20, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-433.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 8, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On September 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 26, 2006 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Chocola moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6131 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
On September 25, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman .
On September 21, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor