+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Laid on the table. See S. 347 for further action.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Kim moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 31, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 86.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 105-232 .
On July 23, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development.
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor