+ − Actions (10)
On September 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On September 29, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
On September 16, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 51.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 504.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 97-818.
On September 14, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On August 10, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 20, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor