+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 3, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 586.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 110-911 .
On July 16, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 10, 2008 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor