+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 6, 1999 in the House:
- See H.R.1000 .
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 603 .
- Rule H. Res. 85 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 85 .
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 85 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Mark Foley to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 603 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. After general debate, the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. The Chairman of the Committee of the Whole may accord priority to those who have printed their amendments in the Congressional Record. At the conclusion of consideration of the bill for amendment, the Committee shall rise and report the bill to the House with amendments as may have been adopted. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. The Chairman may postpone a recorded vote on any amendment and reduce to five minutes the minimum time for electronic voting on any postponed question provided that the minimum time for voting on the first shall be fifteen minutes.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 603 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of all debate on the bill H.R. 603 , the Speaker pro tempore put the question on final passage. Mr. Shuster demanded the yeas and nays and the Speaker pro tempore subsequently noticed sufficient support for the demand. Further proceedings on taking the vote on final passage were postponed until later in the legislative day.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 412 - 2 .
On March 2, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 85 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 603 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. After general debate, the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. The Chairman of the Committee of the Whole may accord priority to those who have printed their amendments in the Congressional Record. At the conclusion of consideration of the bill for amendment, the Committee shall rise and report the bill to the House with amendments as may have been adopted. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. The Chairman may postpone a recorded vote on any amendment and reduce to five minutes the minimum time for electronic voting on any postponed question provided that the minimum time for voting on the first shall be fifteen minutes.
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 17.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-32 .
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor