+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-165.
- Signed by President.
On December 24, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 24, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 20, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 20, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, in lieu of S. 2113 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-546.
On October 16, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 15, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On October 10, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 96-505.
On January 15, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor