+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7643-7644)
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7135)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7135)
- Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
- Ms. Kelly (IL) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor