+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-285.
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 20, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7282-7283)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 13, 2022 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7772-7773)
- Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7772)
On September 13, 2022 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5952.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor