+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 16, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-112.
- Signed by President.
On October 8, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 8, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 7, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 7, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On October 6, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On September 24, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 94-504.
On April 15, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor