+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On November 7, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-149.
- Signed by President.
On October 26, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 23, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 23, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On October 18, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 93-471.
On September 18, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 17, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On September 12, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Foreign Affairs, H. Rept. 93-496.
On March 21, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor