+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4611-4612)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5918.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4611-4613)
- Mr. McNerney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 422.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-522.
On July 15, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House