+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On November 27, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5913 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On August 1, 2012 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Investigations, and Management.
On June 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor