+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On July 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On June 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On June 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Armed Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor