+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations. Reported to Senate by Senator Mattingly with amendments. With written report No. 98-567.
- Subcommittee on Military Construction. Approved for full committee consideration with amendments favorably.
- Committee on Appropriations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On July 25, 1984 in the Senate:
On June 29, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 347 - 52 .
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- House Agreed to Amendments Adopted by the Committee of the Whole.
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.532 Reported to House.
On June 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules Granted a Rule Waiving all Points of Order Against Specified Paragraphs of the Bill for Failure to Comply with the Provisions of Clause 2, Rule XXI .
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 491.
On June 20, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate Subcommittee on Military Construction. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House.
On June 20, 1984 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Appropriations. Report No: 98-850.
On June 19, 1984 in the House:
- First Day of Committee Mark-up.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Final Day of Committee Mark-up.
On June 12, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Final Day of Subcommittee Mark-up.
- First Day of Subcommittee Mark-up.
On April 12, 1984 in the House:
- Final Day of Subcommittee Hearings.
On March 23, 1984 in the House:
On March 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate Subcommittee on Military Construction. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House.
On March 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate Subcommittee on Military Construction. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House.
On March 20, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate Subcommittee on Military Construction. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-1287.
On February 28, 1984 in the House:
- First Day of Subcommittee Hearings.
On February 1, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Construction.
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor