+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-252. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On November 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6493)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Mr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5886-5887)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5873.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5886)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 145.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-772.
On September 14, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On July 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor