+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On September 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On September 17, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On August 9, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 30, 1984 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 98-918 .
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
On June 12, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- For Previous Action See H.R.4954 .
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor